Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 04/14/2011
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 05/05/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 05/26/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/01/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/02/2011
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 07/07/2011