Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 03/29/2011
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 03/29/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/29/2011
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3]* 03/29/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 03/29/2011
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 04/14/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 05/02/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 05/02/2011
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 05/02/2011
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 05/04/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/04/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/13/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/13/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/13/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 05/26/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/26/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/26/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/26/2011
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 06/03/2011
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 06/03/2011
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large] 06/24/2011
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/24/2011
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 06/24/2011
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 07/08/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/08/2011
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/08/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/08/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/08/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 07/08/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/15/2011
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/15/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/22/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/29/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/29/2011
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 08/26/2011
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/08/2011
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 09/08/2011
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 09/09/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 09/09/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/09/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 09/12/2011
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 09/15/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/15/2011
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 09/15/2011
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 09/29/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 10/07/2011
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 10/07/2011
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 10/07/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/07/2011
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 10/07/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 10/07/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 10/07/2011
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 10/31/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/31/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 11/03/2011
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 11/03/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 11/29/2011
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 11/29/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 12/02/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 12/20/2011
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 12/20/2011
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 01/10/2012
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 02/02/2012
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 03/16/2012
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 03/20/2012
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/26/2012
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/29/2012
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 04/16/2012
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/24/2012
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 05/09/2012
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 05/17/2012
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/22/2012
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 05/22/2012
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 05/30/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 06/07/2012
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/27/2012
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/09/2012
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 07/11/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/23/2012
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 07/26/2012
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 07/30/2012
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 08/01/2012
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 08/02/2012
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-29] 08/02/2012
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 08/02/2012
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 09/10/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 09/10/2012
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 09/10/2012
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 09/14/2012
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 09/19/2012
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 09/21/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 09/21/2012
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 09/21/2012
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 11/14/2012