Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 10/13/2011
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 10/13/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 10/26/2011
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 10/26/2011
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 10/26/2011
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 10/26/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 10/26/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/26/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 10/26/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 10/26/2011
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 10/26/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 10/26/2011
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 10/26/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 10/26/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 10/26/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 10/26/2011
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 10/26/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 10/26/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/26/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 10/26/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 10/26/2011
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/26/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 10/26/2011
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 10/26/2011
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 10/26/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/26/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 10/26/2011
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 10/26/2011
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 10/26/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 10/26/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/26/2011
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 10/26/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/26/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/26/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 10/26/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 10/26/2011
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 10/26/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 10/26/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/26/2011
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 10/26/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/26/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 10/26/2011
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 10/26/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/26/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/26/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/26/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 10/26/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/26/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 10/26/2011
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 10/26/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 10/26/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 10/26/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/26/2011
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 10/26/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/26/2011
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 10/26/2011
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 10/26/2011
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 10/26/2011
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 10/26/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 10/26/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/26/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 10/26/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 10/26/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/26/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 10/26/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 10/26/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 10/26/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 10/26/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/26/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 10/26/2011
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 10/26/2011
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 10/26/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 10/26/2011
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 10/26/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 10/26/2011
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 10/26/2011
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 10/26/2011
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 10/26/2011
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 10/26/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 10/26/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 10/26/2011
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 10/26/2011
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/26/2011
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 10/26/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 10/26/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 10/26/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 10/26/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/26/2011
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 10/26/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 10/26/2011
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 10/26/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 10/27/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 10/27/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 11/01/2011
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 11/01/2011
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 11/02/2011
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 11/02/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 11/02/2011
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 11/29/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 12/19/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 01/24/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/02/2012
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/27/2012
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/05/2012
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/21/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 09/10/2012
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 11/02/2012