Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/29/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/29/2011
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 03/29/2011
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 04/01/2011
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19] 05/02/2011
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/02/2011
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/24/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/11/2011
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 07/12/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/07/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/09/2011
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 09/14/2011
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19] 10/11/2011
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-20] 10/11/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 11/02/2011
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 11/04/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 11/04/2011
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 11/04/2011
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 11/04/2011
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 11/04/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 11/15/2011
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 11/15/2011
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 11/15/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 11/16/2011
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 11/17/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 12/01/2011
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 12/01/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 12/01/2011
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 12/05/2011
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 12/07/2011
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 12/14/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 12/14/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 12/16/2011
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 12/16/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 01/17/2012
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 01/17/2012
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 01/24/2012
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 01/24/2012
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 01/24/2012
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 01/27/2012
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 02/14/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 02/14/2012
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 02/16/2012
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8] 02/16/2012
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 02/16/2012
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 02/21/2012
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 02/21/2012
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/21/2012
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 02/28/2012
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 02/29/2012
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/29/2012
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 03/29/2012
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 03/29/2012
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/29/2012
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/29/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 03/29/2012
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 04/19/2012
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/27/2012