Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 04/13/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/13/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/13/2011
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 04/13/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 04/13/2011
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 05/13/2011
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 05/13/2011
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 05/13/2011
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/13/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/13/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/15/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 06/15/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 06/15/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/06/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 07/06/2011
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 07/06/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 09/19/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/19/2011
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 09/19/2011
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 09/26/2011
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 09/29/2011
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 10/04/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 10/11/2011
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24] 10/18/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 12/19/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 12/19/2011
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 12/19/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 02/21/2012
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/13/2012