Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/17/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8]* 03/17/2011
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 03/17/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 03/17/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 03/17/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/30/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/30/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 03/30/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 03/30/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 03/30/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 03/30/2011
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/30/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/30/2011
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-20] 03/30/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 03/30/2011
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 03/31/2011
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 03/31/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/07/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 04/07/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 04/07/2011
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 04/07/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/02/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/02/2011
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/02/2011
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 05/03/2011
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 05/04/2011
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 05/12/2011
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/12/2011
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/12/2011
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 06/02/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 06/21/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/21/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/21/2011
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 07/25/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 08/01/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 08/05/2011
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 09/08/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 09/08/2011
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 10/24/2011
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 12/14/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 01/18/2012