Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/06/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/11/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/11/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/19/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/21/2012