Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/16/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 03/17/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/17/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/17/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/17/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 03/17/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/17/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/29/2011
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 03/29/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/29/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 03/29/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/29/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/29/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/29/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/29/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/29/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 03/29/2011
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/29/2011
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/29/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/29/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/29/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/30/2011
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 03/31/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/31/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/31/2011
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 04/05/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 04/05/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/05/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 04/06/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/08/2011
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 04/12/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/05/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/11/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 05/24/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/06/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/06/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/12/2011
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 08/01/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 09/13/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 09/13/2011
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 10/31/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/01/2012