Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 03/16/2011
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 03/16/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 03/29/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 04/04/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 04/04/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/15/2011
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 04/15/2011
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/15/2011
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 05/03/2011
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 06/13/2011
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/13/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 06/14/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/21/2011
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/14/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 03/07/2012
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 04/25/2012
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 04/27/2012
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 04/27/2012
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 04/27/2012
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/07/2012
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 06/01/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 06/01/2012
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/08/2012
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 07/31/2012
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 09/20/2012