Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 03/17/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 03/17/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 03/17/2011
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 03/17/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 03/31/2011
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 03/31/2011
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 03/31/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/31/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/31/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 03/31/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 03/31/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 03/31/2011
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 03/31/2011
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 03/31/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 03/31/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/31/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 03/31/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 03/31/2011
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 03/31/2011
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/31/2011
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 03/31/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 03/31/2011
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 03/31/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 04/01/2011
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 04/01/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 04/01/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 04/04/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/04/2011
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 04/04/2011
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 04/04/2011
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 04/04/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 04/04/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 04/06/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/06/2011
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 04/06/2011
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 04/06/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/06/2011
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 04/06/2011
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 04/06/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 04/06/2011
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 04/06/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 04/07/2011
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 04/07/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 04/07/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 04/07/2011
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 04/07/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 04/07/2011
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 04/07/2011
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 04/08/2011
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 04/08/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 04/08/2011
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 04/08/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 04/08/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 04/12/2011
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 04/12/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/12/2011
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3] 04/12/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/12/2011
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 04/12/2011
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 04/12/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 04/12/2011
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 04/12/2011
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 04/12/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/12/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 04/12/2011
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 04/14/2011
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 04/14/2011
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 04/14/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 04/14/2011
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 04/14/2011
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/14/2011
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 04/14/2011
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 04/14/2011
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 04/14/2011
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 04/14/2011
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 04/14/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 04/14/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/14/2011
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/14/2011
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 04/14/2011
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 04/14/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/04/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/04/2011
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 05/04/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/04/2011
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 05/04/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/04/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 05/04/2011
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 05/04/2011
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8] 05/04/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 05/04/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 05/04/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 05/04/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 05/04/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 05/04/2011
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 05/04/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 05/04/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/04/2011
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 05/04/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 05/04/2011
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 05/04/2011
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 05/04/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 05/04/2011
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 05/04/2011
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 05/04/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 05/05/2011
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 05/05/2011
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 05/05/2011
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 05/05/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/12/2011
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 05/12/2011
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 05/12/2011
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 05/12/2011
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 05/12/2011
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 05/12/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 05/13/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 06/03/2011
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 06/03/2011
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 06/03/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 06/03/2011
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 06/03/2011
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 06/03/2011
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 06/03/2011
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 06/13/2011
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25] 06/13/2011
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/21/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 06/21/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 06/21/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 06/21/2011
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 06/23/2011
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 06/23/2011
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 07/12/2011
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19] 07/12/2011
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 07/12/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 07/12/2011
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 07/12/2011
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/15/2011
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/15/2011
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 07/15/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/21/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 07/21/2011
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 07/21/2011
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3] 07/21/2011
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 07/22/2011
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/22/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/29/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 07/29/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 07/29/2011
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/29/2011
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 07/29/2011
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 08/01/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 08/01/2011
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 08/05/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 08/19/2011
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 09/09/2011
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 10/14/2011
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 10/14/2011
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 10/14/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 10/14/2011
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 10/14/2011
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 10/14/2011
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 10/14/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 10/14/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 10/31/2011
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 10/31/2011
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 10/31/2011
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 11/10/2011
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 01/23/2012
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 02/02/2012
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/05/2012
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/20/2012
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 09/14/2012

Show cosponsors who withdrew