Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 03/15/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 03/15/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 03/16/2011
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 03/16/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 03/16/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/16/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/17/2011
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 03/17/2011
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3] 03/17/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/17/2011
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/17/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 03/17/2011
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 03/17/2011
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 03/17/2011
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/17/2011
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 03/17/2011
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 03/17/2011
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 03/29/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/29/2011
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 03/29/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/29/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/29/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/29/2011
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 03/29/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 03/29/2011
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 03/29/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 03/29/2011
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 03/30/2011
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 03/30/2011
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 03/30/2011
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 03/30/2011
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/30/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/30/2011
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 03/31/2011
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/31/2011
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 03/31/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 03/31/2011
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 03/31/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/31/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/01/2011
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 04/01/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 04/04/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 04/04/2011
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 04/04/2011
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 04/04/2011
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 04/08/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 04/08/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 04/08/2011
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 04/08/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/08/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/08/2011
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 04/12/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/12/2011
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 04/14/2011
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 04/14/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 04/14/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/14/2011
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 04/14/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 05/02/2011
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 05/02/2011
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 05/02/2011
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 05/02/2011
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3] 05/02/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 05/04/2011
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/04/2011
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 05/04/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 05/13/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 05/13/2011
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 05/13/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 06/03/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 06/03/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 11/16/2011
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 11/16/2011

Show cosponsors who withdrew