Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 03/11/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 03/11/2011
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25]* 03/11/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 03/11/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 03/11/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 03/11/2011
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1]* 03/11/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 03/11/2011
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 03/11/2011
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 03/11/2011
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 03/11/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 03/11/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 03/11/2011
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3]* 03/11/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 03/11/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 03/11/2011
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 03/11/2011
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 03/11/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7]* 03/11/2011
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/15/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 03/15/2011
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 03/29/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 03/29/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 03/30/2011
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 03/30/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 03/30/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/30/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 03/30/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 03/30/2011
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 03/30/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 03/30/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 03/30/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 03/30/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 04/08/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/19/2011