Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 01/05/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 01/05/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 01/07/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 01/12/2011
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 01/18/2011
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 01/18/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 01/19/2011
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 01/19/2011
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 01/20/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 01/24/2011
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 01/24/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/08/2011
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/08/2011
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 02/11/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 02/17/2011
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 02/18/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 02/18/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 02/28/2011
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 03/02/2011
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8] 03/03/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/03/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 03/08/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/09/2011
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 03/10/2011
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 03/11/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/14/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/15/2011
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 03/29/2011
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 03/29/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/29/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 03/29/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/29/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/29/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/29/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 03/29/2011
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 03/29/2011
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 03/29/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 03/29/2011
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 03/30/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 03/30/2011
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 03/31/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 03/31/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/01/2011
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 04/05/2011
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 04/05/2011
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 04/05/2011
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 04/06/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 04/06/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/06/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 04/13/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 04/13/2011
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 04/14/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/14/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/03/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/03/2011
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/03/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 05/03/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/04/2011
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 05/04/2011
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 05/04/2011
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 05/04/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 05/04/2011
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/05/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/05/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/10/2011
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 05/10/2011
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/10/2011
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 05/11/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/12/2011
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 05/13/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/23/2011
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 05/24/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 05/24/2011
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/31/2011
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 06/13/2011
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 06/13/2011
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 06/23/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 07/07/2011
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/12/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/12/2011
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 07/13/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 07/15/2011
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 07/19/2011
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 07/20/2011
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 07/27/2011
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 07/27/2011
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 08/01/2011
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 08/05/2011
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 08/05/2011
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 08/26/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 09/06/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/09/2011
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 09/12/2011
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 09/14/2011
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 09/21/2011
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 09/22/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 09/22/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 09/22/2011
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 09/23/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 09/23/2011
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 09/23/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 09/29/2011
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 10/03/2011
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 10/05/2011
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 10/12/2011
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 10/12/2011
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 10/21/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/21/2011
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 10/31/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 10/31/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 10/31/2011
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 11/01/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 11/01/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 11/01/2011
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 11/02/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 11/02/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 11/04/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 11/10/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 11/15/2011
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 12/02/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 12/08/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 12/13/2011
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 12/15/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 12/16/2011
Rep. Hochul, Kathleen C. [D-NY-26] 12/20/2011
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 01/10/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 01/13/2012
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 01/13/2012
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 01/18/2012
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 01/18/2012
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 01/23/2012
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 01/23/2012
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 01/24/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 01/24/2012
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 01/24/2012
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 01/24/2012
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 01/25/2012
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 01/25/2012
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 01/25/2012
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 01/27/2012
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 01/27/2012
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 01/27/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 01/31/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 01/31/2012
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 01/31/2012
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 02/02/2012
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 02/06/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/08/2012
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 02/08/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 02/09/2012
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 02/17/2012
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 02/27/2012
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 02/27/2012
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 02/28/2012
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19] 03/01/2012
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 03/07/2012
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 03/07/2012
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 03/08/2012
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 03/13/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 03/19/2012
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 03/22/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 03/27/2012
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 03/27/2012
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 04/16/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 04/16/2012
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 04/18/2012
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 04/18/2012
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 04/24/2012
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/09/2012
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/15/2012
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 06/06/2012
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25] 09/19/2012