Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 06/03/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/07/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 09/07/2011
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 07/18/2012
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 07/18/2012
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 11/30/2012