Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 04/12/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/12/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/12/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/12/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/14/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/14/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 04/14/2011
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 04/14/2011
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/14/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/14/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/14/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/03/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/03/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/03/2011
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 05/03/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 05/03/2011
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 05/03/2011
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 05/04/2011
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/04/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/04/2011
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 05/26/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/26/2011
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 07/07/2011
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 07/07/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/11/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/11/2011
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 07/11/2011
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 07/13/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/20/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 07/20/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/14/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/14/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/14/2011
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 09/14/2011
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/14/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 12/20/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/06/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 11/29/2012