Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 03/19/2009
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 03/19/2009
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID]* 03/19/2009
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 03/19/2009
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 03/19/2009
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 03/19/2009
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 03/19/2009
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 03/19/2009
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 03/19/2009
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN]* 03/19/2009
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT]* 03/19/2009
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 03/19/2009
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 03/19/2009
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 03/19/2009
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 03/19/2009
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 03/19/2009
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT]* 03/19/2009
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 03/19/2009
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL]* 03/19/2009
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 03/19/2009
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY]* 03/19/2009
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 03/19/2009
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 03/19/2009
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 03/19/2009
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 03/19/2009
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE]* 03/19/2009
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 03/19/2009
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 03/19/2009
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 03/19/2009
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 03/19/2009
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 03/19/2009
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH]* 03/19/2009
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 03/19/2009
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 03/19/2009
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 03/19/2009
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 03/19/2009
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 03/19/2009
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 03/19/2009
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 03/19/2009
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN]* 03/19/2009
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 03/19/2009
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 03/30/2009
Sen. Kaufman, Edward E. [D-DE] 03/30/2009
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 03/30/2009
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 03/30/2009
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 03/31/2009
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 03/31/2009
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 03/31/2009
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 03/31/2009
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 03/31/2009
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/31/2009
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 03/31/2009
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 04/20/2009
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 04/29/2009
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 06/10/2009
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 06/11/2009
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 06/11/2009
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 06/11/2009
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 06/11/2009
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 06/11/2009
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 06/11/2009
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 06/11/2009
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/11/2009
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 06/11/2009
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 06/11/2009
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 06/11/2009
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 06/15/2009
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 06/15/2009
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 06/15/2009
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 06/15/2009
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/15/2009
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 06/16/2009
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 06/17/2009
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 06/17/2009
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 06/18/2009
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 06/18/2009
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 06/18/2009
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 06/19/2009
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 06/19/2009
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 06/22/2009
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 06/22/2009
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 06/22/2009
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/25/2009
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 06/25/2009