Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 05/05/2009
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 05/05/2009
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 05/05/2009
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 05/05/2009
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 05/05/2009
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 05/05/2009
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 05/05/2009
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 05/05/2009
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 05/05/2009
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 05/05/2009
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 05/05/2009
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 05/05/2009
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 05/05/2009
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 05/05/2009
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 05/05/2009
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 05/05/2009
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 05/05/2009
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 05/05/2009
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 05/05/2009
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 05/05/2009
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT]* 05/05/2009
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 05/05/2009
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 05/05/2009
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 05/05/2009
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 05/05/2009
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 05/05/2009
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 05/05/2009
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 05/05/2009
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE]* 05/05/2009
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 05/05/2009
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO]* 05/05/2009
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 05/05/2009
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL]* 05/05/2009
Sen. Kaufman, Edward E. [D-DE]* 05/05/2009
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM]* 05/05/2009
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO]* 05/05/2009
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 05/05/2009
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 05/05/2009
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 05/05/2009
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR]* 05/05/2009
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 05/06/2009
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 05/06/2009
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 05/06/2009
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 05/07/2009
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 05/07/2009
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 05/11/2009
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 05/11/2009
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 05/11/2009
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 05/11/2009
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 05/12/2009
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 05/18/2009
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 05/20/2009
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 06/01/2009
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/01/2009
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 06/01/2009
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 06/01/2009
Sen. Specter, Arlen [D-PA] 06/03/2009