Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL]* 04/28/2009
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 04/28/2009
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 06/09/2009
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 06/10/2009
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 07/27/2009
Sen. LeMieux, George S. [R-FL] 02/23/2010
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 03/17/2010