Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 04/03/2009
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 04/03/2009
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 04/28/2009
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 05/04/2009
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 03/04/2010
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 07/22/2010