Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY]* 03/23/2009
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 03/23/2009
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 03/23/2009
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 03/23/2009
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 03/25/2009
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 04/20/2009
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 04/20/2009
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 04/23/2009
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 05/07/2009
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 07/27/2009
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 08/03/2009
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 08/03/2009
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 08/03/2009