Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 02/22/2010
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 02/24/2010
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 03/22/2010
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA] 04/27/2010
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 05/13/2010
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 05/13/2010
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 05/13/2010
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 05/13/2010
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 05/13/2010
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 05/13/2010
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 05/13/2010
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 05/13/2010
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 05/13/2010
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 05/13/2010
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 05/13/2010
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 05/13/2010
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 05/13/2010
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 05/13/2010
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 05/13/2010
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 05/17/2010
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 05/17/2010
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 05/17/2010
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 05/17/2010
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 05/17/2010
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 05/17/2010
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 05/17/2010
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 05/17/2010
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 05/17/2010
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 05/17/2010
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 05/17/2010
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 05/17/2010
Sen. LeMieux, George S. [R-FL] 05/17/2010
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 05/17/2010
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 05/17/2010
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 05/17/2010
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 05/17/2010
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 05/17/2010
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 05/17/2010
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 05/17/2010
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 05/19/2010
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 05/19/2010
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 05/19/2010
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 05/19/2010
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 05/19/2010
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 05/19/2010
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 05/19/2010
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 05/19/2010
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 05/20/2010
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 05/20/2010
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 05/20/2010
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 05/20/2010
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/20/2010
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 05/20/2010
Sen. Kaufman, Edward E. [D-DE] 05/20/2010
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 05/20/2010
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 05/20/2010
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 05/24/2010
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 05/24/2010
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 05/24/2010
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 05/24/2010
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 05/24/2010
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/25/2010
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 05/25/2010
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 05/25/2010
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 05/25/2010
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 05/25/2010
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 05/25/2010
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 05/25/2010
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 05/27/2010
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 05/27/2010
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 05/27/2010
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 05/27/2010
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 05/27/2010
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 05/27/2010
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 05/27/2010
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 05/27/2010
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 05/28/2010
Sen. Specter, Arlen [D-PA] 05/28/2010
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 06/08/2010