Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 02/24/2009
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 03/17/2009
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 03/19/2009
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 03/24/2009
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 03/24/2009
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 03/24/2009
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 04/01/2009
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 04/01/2009
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 04/27/2009
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 04/27/2009
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 04/27/2009
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 05/12/2009
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 06/01/2009
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 06/01/2009
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 06/01/2009
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 06/01/2009
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 06/03/2009
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 06/03/2009
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 06/11/2009
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 06/11/2009
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 06/11/2009
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 06/11/2009
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 06/23/2009
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 06/25/2009
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/25/2009
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 06/25/2009
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 06/25/2009
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 07/06/2009
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 07/06/2009
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 07/07/2009
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 07/08/2009
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 07/09/2009
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 07/16/2009
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 07/16/2009
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 07/27/2009
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 07/28/2009
Sen. Specter, Arlen [D-PA] 08/04/2009
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 08/05/2009
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 09/08/2009
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 09/14/2009
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 09/16/2009
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 09/17/2009
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 09/29/2009
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 10/14/2009
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 10/14/2009
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 10/15/2009
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 10/27/2009
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 11/02/2009
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 11/09/2009
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 11/30/2009
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 11/30/2009
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 12/07/2009
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 03/05/2010