Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 02/04/2009
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 02/04/2009
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN]* 02/04/2009
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 02/04/2009
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 02/09/2009
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 03/12/2009
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 04/14/2010
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 07/28/2010