Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 06/21/2010
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 06/28/2010
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 07/19/2010
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 07/19/2010
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 07/21/2010
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 09/13/2010