Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 05/24/2010
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 05/26/2010
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 05/27/2010
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 09/13/2010
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 09/23/2010
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 09/24/2010
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 09/27/2010
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 09/28/2010
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 09/29/2010
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 09/29/2010
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 09/29/2010
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 09/29/2010
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 11/15/2010
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 11/17/2010
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 11/29/2010
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 12/08/2010