Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT]* 05/13/2010
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 05/13/2010
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 05/24/2010
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 06/07/2010
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 06/07/2010
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 06/24/2010
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 07/19/2010
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 07/19/2010
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 09/27/2010