Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 05/03/2010
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 05/03/2010
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 05/03/2010
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 05/03/2010
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 05/03/2010
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 05/06/2010
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 05/06/2010
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 05/10/2010
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 05/10/2010
Sen. Specter, Arlen [D-PA] 05/13/2010
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 05/17/2010
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 05/17/2010
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 05/20/2010
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 05/20/2010
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 05/27/2010
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 06/08/2010