Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kaufman, Edward E. [D-DE]* 02/25/2010
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 02/25/2010
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 02/25/2010
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 02/25/2010
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 02/25/2010
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 03/01/2010
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 03/01/2010
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 03/01/2010
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 06/25/2010
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 07/12/2010
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 07/13/2010