Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 12/22/2009
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 12/23/2009
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 02/23/2010
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 04/14/2010
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 08/05/2010
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 09/13/2010
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 09/13/2010