Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 12/09/2009
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 12/14/2009
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 12/16/2009
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 12/22/2009
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 03/15/2010
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 04/15/2010
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 04/28/2010
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 05/19/2010
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 05/19/2010
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 05/19/2010
Sen. Specter, Arlen [D-PA] 05/19/2010
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 05/19/2010
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 05/27/2010