Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 01/14/2009
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 01/14/2009
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 01/26/2009
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 01/30/2009
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 03/23/2009
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 04/20/2009
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 06/10/2009
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 06/16/2009
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 07/27/2009
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 07/27/2009
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 08/06/2009
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 08/06/2009