Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 09/24/2009
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 09/24/2009
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 09/24/2009
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 09/24/2009
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM]* 09/24/2009
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 09/24/2009
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 09/24/2009
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 10/29/2009
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 07/20/2010
Sen. LeMieux, George S. [R-FL] 08/03/2010
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 09/13/2010
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 11/17/2010