Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 09/22/2009
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 09/25/2009
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 09/29/2009
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 10/07/2009
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 10/07/2009
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 10/08/2009