Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 09/22/2009
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 09/22/2009
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 09/24/2009
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 09/29/2009
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 10/05/2009
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 10/14/2009
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 10/22/2009
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 10/26/2009
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 11/09/2009
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 11/10/2009
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 12/04/2009
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 01/28/2010
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 02/24/2010
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 05/03/2010