Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 07/29/2009
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 08/03/2009
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 08/06/2009
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 08/06/2009
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 09/09/2009
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 09/09/2009
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 10/21/2009
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 10/27/2009
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 11/09/2009
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 11/10/2009
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 12/07/2009
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 12/07/2009
Sen. LeMieux, George S. [R-FL] 12/07/2009
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 02/02/2010
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 02/02/2010