Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE]* 07/21/2009
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 09/23/2009
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 10/29/2009
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 03/17/2010
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 04/12/2010
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 07/12/2010
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 07/12/2010
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 07/12/2010
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 09/20/2010