Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 07/08/2009
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE]* 07/08/2009
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 07/09/2009
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 07/09/2009
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 07/10/2009
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 07/13/2009
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 07/13/2009
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 07/14/2009
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 07/14/2009
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 07/15/2009
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 07/15/2009
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 07/15/2009
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 07/15/2009
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 07/15/2009
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 07/15/2009
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 07/15/2009
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 07/15/2009
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 07/15/2009
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 07/15/2009
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 07/15/2009
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 07/16/2009
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 07/16/2009
Sen. Specter, Arlen [D-PA] 07/16/2009
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 07/16/2009
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 07/16/2009
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 07/16/2009
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 07/16/2009
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 07/16/2009
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 07/16/2009
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 07/16/2009
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 07/16/2009
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 07/20/2009
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 07/20/2009
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 07/20/2009
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 07/20/2009
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 07/20/2009
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 07/20/2009
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 07/20/2009
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 07/20/2009
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 07/20/2009
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 07/20/2009
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 07/20/2009
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 07/21/2009
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 07/21/2009
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 07/21/2009
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 07/21/2009
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 07/21/2009
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 07/22/2009
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 07/22/2009
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 07/22/2009
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 07/22/2009
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 07/22/2009
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 07/22/2009
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 07/22/2009
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 07/22/2009
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 07/22/2009
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 07/22/2009
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 07/22/2009
Sen. Kaufman, Edward E. [D-DE] 07/22/2009
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 12/16/2010