Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 06/25/2009
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 06/25/2009
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO]* 06/25/2009
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 06/25/2009
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 06/25/2009
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 06/25/2009
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO]* 06/25/2009
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 06/25/2009
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 07/06/2009
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 07/06/2009
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 07/08/2009
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 07/13/2009
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 08/04/2009
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 10/01/2009