Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 06/23/2009
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/23/2009
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 06/24/2009
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 06/24/2009
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 06/25/2009
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 06/25/2009
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 06/25/2009
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 07/06/2009
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 07/06/2009
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 07/06/2009
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 07/06/2009
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 07/06/2009
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 07/07/2009
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 07/07/2009
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 07/09/2009
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 07/09/2009
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 07/09/2009
Sen. Specter, Arlen [D-PA] 07/10/2009
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 07/13/2009
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 07/13/2009
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 07/14/2009
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 07/14/2009
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 07/14/2009
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 07/14/2009
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 07/15/2009
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 07/16/2009
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 07/20/2009
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 07/21/2009
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 07/21/2009
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 07/23/2009
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 07/27/2009
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 07/31/2009
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 07/31/2009
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 08/06/2009
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 09/08/2009
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 09/10/2009
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 09/10/2009
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 09/17/2009
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 09/17/2009
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 09/24/2009
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 09/25/2009
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 09/30/2009
Sen. Kirk, Paul Grattan, Jr. [D-MA] 10/15/2009
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 10/26/2009
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 10/29/2009
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 12/02/2009
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 12/04/2009
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 12/08/2009