Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 06/09/2009
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 06/09/2009
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 06/09/2009
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 06/09/2009
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 06/09/2009
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 06/09/2009
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 06/09/2009
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 06/10/2009
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 06/15/2009
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 06/23/2009
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 07/16/2009
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 09/08/2009
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 05/10/2010