Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 12/16/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 12/16/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2]* 12/16/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2]* 12/16/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 12/19/2009
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 12/19/2009
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 01/13/2010
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 01/19/2010
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 03/15/2010
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 04/28/2010