Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 12/15/2009
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 12/15/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 12/15/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 12/15/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 12/15/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 12/15/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 12/15/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 12/15/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 12/15/2009
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 12/15/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 12/15/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 12/15/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 12/15/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 12/15/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 12/15/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 12/15/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 12/15/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 12/15/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 12/15/2009
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32]* 12/15/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3]* 12/15/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 12/15/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 12/15/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 12/15/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 12/15/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 12/15/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 12/15/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 12/15/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 12/15/2009
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 12/15/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 12/15/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 12/15/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 12/16/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 01/12/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 01/12/2010
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 01/20/2010
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 01/27/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 02/02/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 02/04/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/14/2010