Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 12/03/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 12/03/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 12/03/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 12/07/2009
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 12/07/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 12/11/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 12/11/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 12/11/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 12/16/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 12/16/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 02/03/2010
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 02/03/2010
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 02/23/2010
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/25/2010
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 07/29/2010