Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 11/19/2009
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2] 12/03/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 12/03/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 12/03/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 12/15/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 12/15/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 01/12/2010
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 01/13/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/21/2010
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 01/21/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 01/21/2010
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 02/22/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 02/22/2010
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 03/02/2010
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/02/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/29/2010