Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 11/03/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 11/16/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 11/16/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 11/16/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 11/16/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 11/16/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 11/16/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 11/16/2009
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 11/16/2009
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 11/16/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/16/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 11/16/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 11/16/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 11/16/2009
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 11/16/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 11/16/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 11/16/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 11/16/2009
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 11/16/2009
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 11/16/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 11/16/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 11/16/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 11/18/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 11/18/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 11/18/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 11/18/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 11/18/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 11/18/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 11/18/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 11/18/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 11/18/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 11/19/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 12/01/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 12/01/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 12/01/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 12/09/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 12/09/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 12/09/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 01/26/2010
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 01/26/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 01/26/2010
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 01/26/2010
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 01/26/2010
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 01/26/2010
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 01/26/2010
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 01/26/2010
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 01/26/2010
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 01/26/2010
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 01/26/2010
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 01/26/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 01/26/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 01/26/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 01/26/2010
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 01/26/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 01/26/2010
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 01/26/2010
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 01/26/2010
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 01/26/2010
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 01/26/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 01/26/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 01/26/2010
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 01/26/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 01/26/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 01/26/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 01/26/2010
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 01/26/2010
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 01/26/2010
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 01/26/2010
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 01/26/2010
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 01/26/2010
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 01/26/2010
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 01/26/2010
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 01/26/2010
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 02/24/2010