Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 10/23/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 10/23/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 10/23/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 10/26/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 10/26/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 10/26/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 10/26/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 10/28/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 10/28/2009
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 10/28/2009
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 10/28/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 10/28/2009
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 10/28/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 10/28/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 10/29/2009
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 10/29/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 10/29/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 11/03/2009
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 11/03/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 12/03/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 01/27/2010
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 01/27/2010
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 03/17/2010
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 03/17/2010
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 07/13/2010