Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 10/27/2009
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 10/27/2009
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 10/27/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 10/27/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 10/27/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 10/27/2009
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 10/27/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 10/27/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 10/27/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 10/27/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 10/27/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 10/27/2009
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 10/27/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 10/27/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 10/27/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 10/27/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 10/27/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 10/27/2009
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 10/27/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 10/27/2009
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 10/27/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 10/27/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 10/27/2009
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 10/27/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 10/27/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 10/27/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 10/27/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 10/27/2009
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 10/27/2009
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 10/27/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 10/27/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 10/27/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 10/27/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 10/27/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 10/27/2009
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 10/27/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/27/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 10/27/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 10/27/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 10/27/2009
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 10/28/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 10/28/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 10/28/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 10/28/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 10/28/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 10/28/2009
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 10/28/2009
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 10/28/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 10/28/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 10/28/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 10/28/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 10/28/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/28/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 10/28/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 10/28/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 10/28/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 10/28/2009
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 10/28/2009
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 10/28/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 10/28/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 10/28/2009
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 10/28/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 10/28/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 10/28/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 10/28/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 10/28/2009
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 10/28/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 10/28/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 10/28/2009
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 10/28/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 10/28/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 10/28/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 10/28/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 10/28/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 10/28/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 10/28/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 10/28/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 10/28/2009
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 10/28/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/28/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 10/29/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 10/29/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/29/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 10/29/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 10/29/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 10/29/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 10/29/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 10/29/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 10/29/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 10/29/2009
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 10/29/2009
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 10/29/2009
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 10/29/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 10/29/2009
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 10/29/2009
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 10/29/2009
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 10/29/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 10/29/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 10/29/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 10/29/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 10/29/2009
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 10/29/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 10/29/2009
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 10/29/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 10/29/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 10/29/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 10/29/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 10/29/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/29/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 10/29/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/29/2009
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 11/02/2009
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 11/02/2009
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 11/02/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 11/02/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 11/02/2009
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 11/02/2009
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 11/02/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 11/02/2009
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 11/02/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 11/02/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 11/02/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 11/02/2009
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 11/02/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 11/02/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 11/02/2009
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 11/02/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 11/02/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 11/02/2009
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 11/02/2009
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 11/02/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 11/02/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 11/02/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 11/02/2009
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 11/02/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 11/02/2009
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 11/02/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 11/02/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 11/02/2009
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 11/02/2009
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 11/02/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 11/02/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 11/02/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 11/02/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 11/02/2009
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 11/02/2009
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 11/02/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 11/03/2009
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 11/03/2009
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 11/03/2009
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 11/03/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 11/03/2009
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 11/03/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 11/03/2009
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 11/03/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 11/03/2009
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 11/03/2009
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 11/03/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 11/03/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 11/03/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 11/03/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 11/03/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 11/03/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 11/03/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 11/03/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 11/03/2009
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 11/03/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 11/03/2009
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 11/03/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 11/03/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 11/03/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 11/03/2009
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 11/03/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 11/03/2009
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 11/03/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 11/03/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 11/03/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 11/03/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 11/03/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 11/03/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 11/03/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 11/03/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 11/03/2009
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 11/03/2009
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 11/03/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 11/03/2009
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 11/03/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 11/03/2009
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 11/03/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 11/03/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 11/03/2009
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 11/03/2009
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 11/03/2009
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 11/03/2009
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 11/03/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 11/03/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 11/03/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 11/03/2009
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 11/03/2009