Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3]* 10/15/2009
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 10/15/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 10/15/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 10/15/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 10/22/2009
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 10/22/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 10/22/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 10/26/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 10/26/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 10/26/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 10/26/2009
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 10/26/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 10/28/2009
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 10/28/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 10/28/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/29/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 11/02/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 11/03/2009