Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 01/26/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 01/26/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 01/26/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 01/28/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 01/28/2009
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 01/28/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 02/03/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 02/10/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 02/10/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 02/10/2009
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 02/13/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/13/2009
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 02/23/2009
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 02/23/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 02/23/2009
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 02/25/2009
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 02/26/2009
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/03/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 03/05/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 03/09/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 03/10/2009
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/11/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/11/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 03/19/2009
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 03/23/2009
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 04/01/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/01/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 04/22/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 04/22/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/22/2009
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 04/22/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/27/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/06/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 05/14/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 05/21/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/21/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 05/21/2009
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 06/04/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 06/04/2009
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 06/04/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 06/08/2009
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/15/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 06/19/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/14/2009