Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 10/06/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 10/07/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/07/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 10/07/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 10/14/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 10/14/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 10/14/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 10/14/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 10/14/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 10/14/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 10/14/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/15/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 10/15/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 10/15/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 10/15/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 10/15/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/20/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/20/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 10/20/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/20/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/20/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/21/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/21/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 10/22/2009